GOODWILL CHILDREN'S HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are" the relief of poverty amongst children in any part of the world" and without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing ... to give effect to the same by providing financial support to Goodwill Children's Homes Charitable Society registered in Tamil Nadu, South India ".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 08 July 1976: Standard registration
- GOODWILL (Working name)
- GOODWILL CHILDREN'S HOME (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL GOODWILL CHILDREN'S VILLAGE SOCIETY (UK ) (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID NEILL | Chair | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amandine ABHERVE - GUEGUEN | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Axelle Marie Martine Favre | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Ling | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BARASS FENWICK | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Teresa Thorne | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|||||
MRS KATIE FENWICK | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE CLARK | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.94k | £161.97k | £144.10k | £218.25k | £96.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.66k | £97.89k | £41.40k | £89.60k | £111.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 1975 AND AMENDED 13 JUNE 1976 AND 7 OCTOBER 1995.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POOR CHILDREN AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE ASSOCIATION MAY DECIDE
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD - IN PRACTICE INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Goodwill Children's Homes
2B Whitefriars
Lewins Mead
BRISTOL
BS1 2NT
- Phone:
- 01173250550
- Email:
- admin@goodwillhomes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window