THE SYSTEMATICS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the advancement of training, research and education of the public in the study of systematic biology. This is achieved primarily by sponsoring symposia, conferences and lectures, by publishing books, and by awarding grants for systematics research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 November 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Peter Mulhair | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pablo Munoz-Rodriguez | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR Alice Ellinor Michel PhD | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Andrew Briscoe PhD | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.48k | £7.49k | £7.49k | £9.55k | £10.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.29k | £8.22k | £9.12k | £10.16k | £15.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 December 2024 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 March 2023 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 14 March 2023 | 744 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF SYSTEMATICS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF RULES ADOPTED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1975).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATURAL HISTORY MUSEUM
CROMWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW7 5BD
- Phone:
- 02079425585
- Email:
- treasurer@systass.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window