Financial history INTER-ACTION (MILTON KEYNES) LIMITED

Charity number: 270458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.06k £48.46k £40.65k £54.76k £32.50k
Total expenditure £65.56k £52.45k £35.51k £44.72k £37.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £10.00k £6.00k £5.00k £4.00k