AGE UK THANET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help and welfare of all elderly people over 60 in the Thanet area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- AGE CONCERN - MARGATE (OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.76k | £349.74k | £46.24k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £288.90k | £385.52k | £337.38k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 12 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 08 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 28 November 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/11/1962 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/1972 AS AMENDED ON 15/08/1975 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL OLD PEOPLE IN THE BOROUGH OF MARGATE BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF THE STATURORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN PROVIDING FACILITES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION DEVELOPING PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF MARGATE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window