THURROCK CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thurrock Citizens Advice Service is independent and provides free, confidential and impartial advice to everybody regardless of race, gender, disability, sexual orientation, nationality, religion or age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £103,300 from government contract(s) and £27,510 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Thurrock
Governance
- 03 December 1975: Standard registration
- 07 October 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 October 2017: Funds transferred to 1164888 CITIZENS ADVICE THURROCK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £557.99k | £450.81k | £386.04k | £451.91k | £227.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £612.98k | £530.96k | £405.91k | £464.58k | £206.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £103.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £169.80k | £27.51k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £295 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £500.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £84 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £56.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £295 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £451.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £161.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1975 AND AS AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THURROCK AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF THURROCK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window