THE SOCIETY OF CLINICAL PERFUSION SCIENTISTS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To progress through discussion and liason with all parties involved in the provision of perfusion services. To advise and guide the membership of the society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 May 1976: Standard registration
- SOCIETY OF PERFUSIONISTS (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF EXTRA CORPOREAL TECHNOLOGISTS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Previous name)
- SOCIETY OF PERFUSIONISTS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Kerr | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Rayner | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Noel Kelleher | Trustee | 17 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.88k | £150.60k | £211.17k | £256.57k | £251.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.95k | £96.45k | £255.71k | £243.00k | £221.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BY-LAWS OF THE ASSOCIATION AS AMENDED 13/10/1978 AS AMENDED 11/1989 AS AMENDED 10/1999 AS AMENDED 24/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/04/2005 AS AMENDED 03/11/2007 AS AMENDED 16/10/2010 AS AMENDED 15/10/2011 AS AMENDED 18/10/2014 as amended on 06 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF PERFUSION TECHNOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE BY ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITIES FOR COLLECTIVE DISCUSSIONS AND ACTION ON SCIENTIFIC MATTERS. B. DISCUSSING AND, WHEN NECESSARY, TAKING ACTION IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE PROFESSION AND THE SOCIETY. C. ESTABLISHING APPROPRIATE PRIMARY EDUCATION LEADING TO ACCREDITATION BY THE SOCIETY. D. PROVIDING TRAINING FOR AND MAINTAIN A REGISTER OF EXAMINERS FOR THE SOCIETY'S ACCREDITATION EXAM. E. ESTABLISHING A LIAISON WITH SCIENTIFIC ASSOCIATIONS, SOCIETIES OR INSTITUTIONS FOR THE MUTUAL ADVANCEMENT OF QUALIFICATIONS AND STANDARDS. F. MONITORING AND ADVISING ON THE TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF SERVICE OF ITS MEMBERS. THE SOCIETY'S OBJECTIVES SHALL NOT EXTEND TO THE REGULATION OF RELATIONS BETWEEN WORKERS AND EMPLOYERS OR ORGANISATIONS OF WORKERS AND EMPLOYERS TO THE INTENT THAT THE SOCIETY SHALL NOT BE A TRADE UNION WITHIN THE MEANING OF TRADE. G. SETTING PROFESSIONAL GUIDANCE IN THE FORM OF 'CODES OF CONDUCT' AND 'STANDARDS OF PRACTICE' DOCUMENTS WHICH WILL FORM THE BENCHMARK FOR MINIMUM STANDARDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCPS of GB & Ireland
Fourth Floor
RCS of England
38 to 43 Lincolns Inn Fields
London
WC2A 3PE
- Phone:
- 020 7869 6891
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window