CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH ROYAL ARMY PAY CORPS

Charity number: 270477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Foster esprit de corps among members of the former Royal Army Pay Corps; to relieve poverty and hardship where former personnel or their dependants find themselves in need; the commemoration, remembrance and encouragement of public recognition of the sacrifices made by members of the RAPC in the service of their Country.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £74,403
Total expenditure: £163,287

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 1975: Standard registration
  • 12 October 1993: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROYAL ARMY PAY CORPS REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colonel Alan Brown Chair 21 March 2017
None on record
Colonel David Rutherford Trustee 15 July 2024
None on record
Colonel Stuart Richard Allen ADC MBE Trustee 12 June 2024
None on record
Mark Michael Theodore Burton-Doe FCMA CGMA Trustee 31 March 2023
ADJUTANT GENERALS CORPS MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
LIEUTENANT COLONEL ALAN MCTAGGART FCMA, CGMA Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
ALFRED JONATHAN WARD Trustee 25 February 2020
ADJUTANT GENERALS CORPS MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Lt Col R A ROSENHEAD MBE FCG Trustee 25 February 2020
None on record
Stephen Roden Trustee 27 October 2017
None on record
Peter Hawkins Trustee 27 October 2017
None on record
MICK COTTON Trustee 18 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £63.13k £50.03k £64.36k £99.50k £74.40k
Total expenditure £110.97k £67.20k £91.21k £99.90k £163.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 16 DECEMBER 1965
Charitable objects
AMALGAMATED INTO CONSTITUENT NO.4 BY VIRTUE OF THE SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 19 AUGUST 1992.IN OR TOWARDS RELIEVING BY OCCASSIONAL OR PERIODICAL GRANTS OF ALLOWANCES OR MONEY OR BY PENSIONS OR OTHERWISE POOR PERSONS IN NEEDY CIRCUMSTANCES WHO ARE EITHER EX-MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL ARMY PAY CORPS OR WIDOWS OF CHILDREN OF SUCH POOR PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN ATTACHED TO SERVED WITH OR HAVE SERVED THE CORPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 05 December 1975 : Standard registration
  • 12 October 1993 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
RAPC REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION
PO Box 2044
Andover
SP10 9LZ
Phone:
07989977743