Financial history SHIPHAM VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 270556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £41.53k £30.48k £39.69k £49.01k £47.68k
Total expenditure £25.38k £16.95k £23.77k £27.73k £33.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.73k £2.67k N/A N/A