SHIPHAM VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ownership and operation of a Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 December 1975: Standard registration
- SHIPHAM COMMUNITY HALL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Ardron | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gregor | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANITA MARY TOWNSEND | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Joyce Gaut | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULES OFFORD | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Andrews | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Ingleby | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Firth | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Leach | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Howell | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dodd | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Catherine Sanders | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ken Chalk | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN GOODIER FIRTH LLB | Trustee | 24 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR MOORHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ANTHONY EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.53k | £30.48k | £39.69k | £49.01k | £47.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.38k | £16.95k | £23.77k | £27.73k | £33.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.73k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/11/1975 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 18/01/2005 AS AMENDED ON 04/12/2007 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/2012 as amended on 14 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SHIPHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHIPHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seagrove
North Down Lane
Shipham
Somerset
- Phone:
- 01934842335
- Email:
- julesofford@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window