Trustees SHIPHAM VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 270556

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Ardron | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gregor | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANITA MARY TOWNSEND | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Joyce Gaut | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULES OFFORD | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Andrews | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Ingleby | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Firth | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Leach | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Howell | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dodd | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Catherine Sanders | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ken Chalk | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN GOODIER FIRTH LLB | Trustee | 24 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR MOORHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ANTHONY EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.