Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN WEEKLY NEWSPAPERS LIMITED

Charity Number: 270655
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 28 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 06 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 11 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required