MISSION WITHOUT BORDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission Without Borders is a Christian charity that aims to serve the spiritual, educational, emotional and material needs of those experiencing the effects of poverty or oppression. Our purpose is to reach people for Christ and as a result we see our role as showing compassion and empathy to all people regardless of their background or religious beliefs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,886,525
Donations and legacies | £2.89m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £439 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,819,217
Raising funds | £332.19k | |
Charitable activities | £2.45m | |
Other | £38.49k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £370.69k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.45m | |
Retained for future use | £67.31k |
People

6 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Moldova
- Northern Ireland
- Romania
- Scotland
- Ukraine
Governance
- 26 January 1976: Standard registration
- CHILD RESCUE INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- CRI (Working name)
- AID TO THE PERSECUTED LIMITED (Previous name)
- EVANGELISM CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- INTERAID LIMITED (Previous name)
- MISSION WITHOUT BORDERS (UK) LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Jordan Thomas | Chair | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Walker | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Farquhar | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BURCHELL MARTIN YOUNG | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.16m | £2.21m | £2.78m | £3.48m | £2.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.15m | £2.15m | £2.59m | £3.44m | £2.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.16m | £2.21m | £2.78m | £3.48m | £2.89m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14 | £8 | £6 | £52 | £439 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £18.56k | £114.53k | £143.32k | £57.29k | £21.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.05m | £1.98m | £2.36m | £3.13m | £2.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £101.31k | £169.09k | £232.88k | £304.38k | £332.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.30k | £14.89k | £13.48k | £16.28k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £38.49k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £896 | £1.89k | £2.84k | £1.38k | £430 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £168.09k | £231.10k | £427.20k | £471.76k | £544.27k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £31.97k | £36.80k | £42.39k | £42.69k | £46.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH AUGUST 1972 AS AMENDED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1975, 11TH JULY 1984, 20TH SEPTEMBER 1992, 30 MAY 2006 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 2014.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROCLAIM THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY OR OPPRESSION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WITHOUT REGARD TO THEIR RELIGIOUS OR ETHNIC BACKGROUNDS. TO HELP SUPPORT AND CARE FOR CHILDREN IN NEED AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN ORPHANED OR ABANDONED OR WHO HAVE BEEN PLACED IN INSTITUTIONS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MISSION WITHOUT BORDERS
175 TOWER BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 2AG
- Phone:
- 02079401370
- Email:
- info@mwbuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window