Accounts and annual returns HORSHAM TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 270707
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2005 28 February 2006 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 28 February 2006 23 days late
Annual return 05 April 2004 21 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 21 January 2005 On Time