FRANCIS COALES CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ASSIST WITH GRANTS FOR THE STRUCTURAL REPAIR OF OLD BUILDINGS (BUILT BEFORE 1875) WHICH ARE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC. PREFERENCE IS GIVEN TO CHURCHES AND THEIR CONTENTS IN THE COUNTIES OF BEDFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, HERTFORDSHIRE AND NORTHAMPTONSHIRE. THERE IS NO TERRITORIAL RESTRICTION IN RESPECT OF CONSERVATION OF MONUMENTS AND MONUMENTAL BRASSES. GRANTS ARE OCCASIONALLY MADE TOWARDS PUBLICATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 03 February 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN STUCHFIELD | Chair | 22 February 1999 |
|
|||||||||
John Vigar | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN CHARLES BARKER | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Matthew John Saunders MBE | Trustee | 03 December 2008 |
|
|||||||||
Rev BRIAN HOWARD WILCOX | Trustee | 18 January 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.61k | £111.55k | £134.47k | £149.30k | £122.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.28k | £129.45k | £132.27k | £120.00k | £117.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 1975 AMENDED BY MEMORANDUM DATED 7 OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FUNDS DIRECTLY OR BY WAY OF GRANT OR LOAN TOWARDS I) THE COST OF ANTIQUARIAN RESEARCH ARCHAEOLOGICAL OR OTHER METHODS ON SITES, BUILDINGS, OBJECTS, DOCUMENTS AND OTHER RELEVANT MATERIAL DATING FROM BEFORE 1875 INCLUDING THE COSTS OF PRINTING AND PUBLICATION (IN WRITING OR ORALLY) OF BOOKS THESES DOCUMENTS AND LECTURES CONCERNED WITH SUCH ANTIQUARIAN RESEARCH. II) THE REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF ANY ECCLESIASTICAL OR OTHER BUILDINGS FROM TIME TO TIME OPENED TO PUBLIC VIEW WHICH SHALL HAVE BEEN BUILT BEFORE THE YEAR 1875. III) THE PURCHASE OF ANY LAND OR BUILDING FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARRYING OUT RESEARCH ON OR RESTORATION OF THE SAME. IV) THE PURCHASE AND STOCKING OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY. V) THE PURCHASE OF ARCHIVES PAPERS AND OTHER ITEMS OF SUFFICIENT EDUCATIONAL, HISTORICAL OR OTHER ANTIQUARIAN INTEREST AND THE REPAIR AND CONSERVATION OF SUCH ITEMS WHETHER IN MUSEUMS, LIBRARIES OR PUBLIC RECORD OFFICES PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH ARCHIVES PAPERS AND OTHER ITEMS SHALL ALWAYS BE AVAILABLE FOR VIEW BY THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Rectory
Rectory Way
Lympsham
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS24 0EW
- Phone:
- 01934750817
- Website:
-
franciscoales.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window