WESTHAM (WEYMOUTH) SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB
Charity Number: 270745
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide activities such as bingo, trips out tea & coffee days, for senior citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Total income: £5,353
Total expenditure: £4,280
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Dorset
Governance
Registration history:
- 23 April 1976: Standard registration
- 24 October 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- WESTHAM SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.19k | £6.29k | £5.37k | £8.63k | £5.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.22k | £5.49k | £4.83k | £7.22k | £4.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 26 October 2015 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 05 August 2014 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1ST MARCH 1975 AS AMENDED 10TH MARCH 1976
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WESTHAM WEYMOUTH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window