Trustees KINGSTON LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE

Charity Number: 270792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Farrer Chair 11 May 2025
None on record
Emily Zinkin Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Joshua Wuggenig Trustee 07 April 2025
None on record
Sara Alston Trustee 02 December 2024
NORTH SURREY DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE
Received: On time
Robyn May Harris Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Dr Alexander Heinz Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Shimon Morad Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Barbara Richards Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Philip Hyman Trustee 05 September 2022
None on record
Tina Higgins Trustee 05 September 2020
None on record
Brian Plaskow Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record