Trustees ISLAMIC CENTRE EDGWARE
Charity Number: 270823

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED GULFAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ABBAS REHMAN | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muzaffar Ahmed | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
RASHID AZIZ | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALEEM BUTT | Trustee | 30 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mirza Nadeem Shahzad | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL RAZZAQ BUTT | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHAMIM AHMED | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
IFTIKHAR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Zaheer Ali | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
AMJAD IQBAL | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHAHID IQBAL | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD NISAR BASHIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NASIR MAHMOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISHTIAQ MAHMOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.