Accounts and annual returns THE CHARLES NEWMAN MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 270824
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 February 2023 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 February 2023 367 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 April 2021 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 April 2021 84 days late Download Open in new window