Financial history UFFCULME VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 270848
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2014 28/02/2015 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018
Total gross income £15.82k £9.81k £11.71k £18.56k £17.02k
Total expenditure £12.79k £11.99k £7.55k £15.64k £15.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £1.00k £6.50k