Financial history CLUTTON VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 270862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.55k £51 £2.62k £7.84k £3.83k
Total expenditure £3.98k £912 £4.80k £5.28k £2.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A