Trustees THE OXFORD KIDNEY UNIT TRUST FUND LIMITED
Charity number: 270869

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PHILIP DAVID MASON FRCP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rupert Liam Adair | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
William John Barnett | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elizabeth Turner | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jasna Macanovic | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Grove | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Udaya Udayaraj | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shamsher Pangu | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Thomas Michael Fearnside Connor | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR RICHARD JOHN HAYNES | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDWARD JOHN SHARPLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLISON THORNLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOCTOR CHRISTOPHER GOOD WINEARLS FRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.