THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S, LEE, CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Lee C of E School is run by parents of pupils at the school. Its purpose is to raise money for extra curricular activities and additional resources for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lewisham
Governance
- 12 March 1976: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF LEE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL (KNOWN AS LEE CHURCH SCHOOL FRIENDS) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Woodall | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Sally Jane Cullen | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark De-Laurey | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Tordesillas | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.07k | £5.79k | £20.26k | £22.33k | £27.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.03k | £8.16k | £18.35k | £21.66k | £30.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 21ST JANUARY 1976, AS AMENDED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING, AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LEWISHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Margaret's Lee C Of E Primary School
Lee Church Street
LONDON
SE13 5SG
- Phone:
- 020 8852 3151
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window