Accounts and annual returns FOUNDATION FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN ECONOMICS

Charity number: 270958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 25 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 09 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 09 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 21 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required