READING PHOENIX CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reading Phoenix Choir is a mixed voice amateur choir. Our objectives are to educate the public in the art and science of music by the presentation of concerts and other activities. To achieve as high a standard as possible in the performance of choral and allied music. To arrange concerts, to enter music festivals and to participate in concerts arranged by other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Mark Farrow | Chair | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pak Sun Pau | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Flavia Hodel | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Dwinell | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Charles Calaghan Barton | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr GILLIAN SINCLAIR | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Karen Hartshorn | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Ruth Madeline Elmore | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Harte | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.16k | £9.89k | £14.17k | £21.53k | £22.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.87k | £7.21k | £15.05k | £18.21k | £21.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JULY 1975, AS AMENDED 13 MAR 1989, 1 FEB 1993 AND 21 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED 21 JULY 2014 as amended on 11 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES,AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC,BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES B) TO ACHIEVE AS HIGH A STANDARD AS POSSIBLE IN THE PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL AND ALLIED MUSIC,WHICH MAY BE SACRED AND SECULAR,ACCOMPANIED AND UNACCOMPANIED,ANCIENT AND MODERN,PART AND FOLK SONGS.THESE MAY BE PERFORMED BY THE WHOLE CHOIR,SOLOISTS OR A GROUP OF MEMBERS.INSTRUMENTAL ITEMS MAY BE INCLUDED IN CONCERTS C) TO ARRANGE CONCERTS,TO ENTER MUSIC FESTIVALS AND TO PARTICIPATE WHOLLY OR IN PART,IN CONCERTS ARRANGED BY OTHER ORGANISATIONS
Area of benefit
CENTRAL BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARTLANDS
TRASH GREEN
BURGHFIELD
READING
RG30 3TS
- Phone:
- 07766312488
- Email:
- info@readingphoenixchoir.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window