THE BARKING AND DAGENHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 270978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides recordings of the local newspaper for visually impaired people in borough.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £352
Total expenditure: £988

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barking And Dagenham
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN BLAKE Chair 23 September 2022
None on record
Dean Apps Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Carol Ann Wilson Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record
IRIS JAMESON Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record
ROGER NICKOLS Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record
JOAN NICKOLS Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record
Pat Costin Trustee 22 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £561 £297 £537 £471 £352
Total expenditure £3.02k £283 £1.75k £365 £988
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
William Bellamy Childrens Centre
Frizlands Lane
DAGENHAM
RM10 7HX
Phone:
07709682133
Website:

No information available