Financial history FRIENDS OF THE HAMPSHIRE COUNTY YOUTH ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 270998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.14k £7.20k £31.57k £25.11k £17.76k
Total expenditure £17.43k £889 £12.80k £37.53k £11.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.80k N/A £16.73k £1.06k £750