Accounts and annual returns THE WATLINGTON MEMORIAL CLUB

Charity number: 271000
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 02 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 02 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 16 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 16 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 16 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 11 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 11 December 2012 On Time