Financial history SHREE KUTCH SATSANG SWAMINARAYAN TEMPLE (MANDIR) LONDON

Charity number: 271034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.63m £1.11m £1.59m £1.68m £2.09m
Total expenditure £557.49k £425.48k £728.96k £715.24k £919.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £721.79k £1.08m £1.12m £1.22m
Income - Other trading activities £3.32k £1.93k £2.92k £3.37k £137.20k
Income - Charitable activities £113.30k £100.57k £95.84k £113.72k £3.98k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £268.95k £286.61k £245.73k £277.97k £541.73k
Income - Other £139.58k £0 £163.75k £163.94k £187.80k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £240.71k £175.57k £179.77k £258.42k £357.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds £316.77k £249.91k £549.19k £456.82k £562.46k
Expenditure - Governance £3.16k £4.40k £0 £15.22k £9.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £8.38k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £44.61k £58.53k £81.08k £112.13k £114.01k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0