Accounts and annual returns WILTSHIRE A C F LEAGUE
Charity Number: 271043
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 22 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 21 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 21 May 2008 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window