PAINSWICK MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims and objectives of the Society is to arrange four high quality classical music concerts each year in St Mary's Church, Painswick, which are greatly appreciated and well attended. Although professional and celebrated artists are usually engaged to maintain the high standards, the cost of tickets is kept to a minimum to make the concerts available to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 April 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Martin Woodhead | Chair | 20 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Jane Mann | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Cutler | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Steel | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Jessica Bailey | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Godfrey Holmes | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward Bowron | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Frances Pack | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Swain | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.41k | £2.66k | £33.88k | £18.76k | £22.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.58k | £2.55k | £53.13k | £23.09k | £20.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 September 2023 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 September 2023 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 4TH JULY 1946 AS AMENDED 16TH MAY 1972
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spring House
High Street
Chalford
STROUD
Gloucestershire
GL6 8DN
- Phone:
- 07903 373674
- Email:
- martinwoodhead@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window