Accounts and annual returns STAMSHAW AND TIPNER LEISURE CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 271120
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 March 2025 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 March 2025 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2025 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2025 359 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 September 2021 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 August 2021 190 days late Download Open in new window