Governing document THE HISTORIC COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JAN 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 APR 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 APR 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, RESTORE AND OPERATE HISTORIC COMMERCIAL VEHICLES AS A PERMANENT PUBLIC EXHIBITION AND MUSEUM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF TECHNICAL, HISTORICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION AND FOR THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION DISPLAY AND DEMONSTRATION OF HISTORIC COMMERCIAL VEHICLES EQUIPMENT, MACHINERY AND RELICS OF HISTORICAL, OPERATIONAL AND GENERAL INTEREST AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.