THE BRIGHTON SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Brighton Society covers Brighton & Hove and immediate surroundings. It is designed to stimulate public interest in the area; promote high standards of planning, architecture and design, as well as improve features of the urban and natural environment of historic, townscape or public interest. Newsletters and illustrated talks demonstrate issues in which the Society has been involved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 29 April 1976: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan Grainger | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Crowhurst | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
NINKA WILLCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Corinne Attwood | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT ARNOLD EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS LYN LYNCH-WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM DAWES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40k | £962 | £1.53k | £6.74k | £910 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £865 | £1.40k | £1.29k | £1.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST APRIL 1975 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
19 TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA . 2. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN IN THE AREA . 3. TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE FEATURES OF THE URBAN AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF BRIGHTON & HOVE AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 SURRENDEN PARK
BRIGHTON
BN1 6XA
- Phone:
- 01273505200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window