Accounts and annual returns AQUARIUS (ALCOHOLICS REHABILITATION COUNCIL)

Charity Number: 271223
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 10 February 2011 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 February 2010 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 26 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 18 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 February 2008 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 27 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 10 January 2007 On Time