Financial history AQUARIUS (ALCOHOLICS REHABILITATION COUNCIL)

Charity number: 271223
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.44k £1.44k £41.45k £22.63k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A