Financial history 2ND CROWTHORNE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 271232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.24k £34.61k £21.91k £26.25k £32.77k
Total expenditure £19.64k £36.02k £16.98k £23.86k £41.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.84k £10.67k N/A £400