Accounts and annual returns GREENWICH ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity Number: 271301
Charity reporting is up to date (146 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 23 December 2024 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 23 December 2024 146 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 October 2022 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 14 October 2022 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 March 2022 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 March 2022 237 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window