Financial history GREENWICH ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity Number: 271301
Charity reporting is up to date (146 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £703.88k £871.03k £1.06m £1.17m £1.05m
Total expenditure £411.32k £439.12k £503.14k £639.80k £707.30k
Income from government contracts £224.37k £242.03k N/A N/A £101.98k
Income from government grants N/A £21.41k £296.90k £202.58k £101.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £683.38k £811.38k £1.00m £1.16m £1.02m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £9.96k £50.33k £44.68k £13.34k £24.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £130 £22 £474 £303 £1.46k
Income - Other £10.40k £9.30k £6.20k £4.80k £7.70k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £368.95k £390.69k £462.00k £613.62k £634.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds £42.36k £48.43k £41.14k £26.19k £72.57k
Expenditure - Governance £15.81k £21.89k £26.53k £8.28k £16.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0