ABBEYFIELD (EXMOUTH) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of supported sheltered accommodation for up to 13 independent older people in 12 x studio flats and 1 x maisonette in one building, Harding House, in Exmouth, East Devon. Two cooked meals a day in communal dining room. Residents prepare own breakfasts. Communal lounge and garden. General and domestic support provided by staff - not 24 hours. Residents buy in personal care if needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 21 May 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEDLEY STUART RITCHIE | Chair | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Bernice Anne Duval-Steer | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROBERT SELLERS | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Eileen Beech | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Francis Richard King Same | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH LAWRENCE | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE MARY ELSON | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.45k | £189.52k | £155.48k | £189.69k | £208.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.36k | £151.29k | £177.41k | £187.59k | £202.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD JUNE 1970; AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1994, SCHEME SEALED 7 MARCH 1997, AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR PEOPLE OF ALL CLASSES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION AND FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
EXMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbeyfield Society (Exmouth) Ltd
101 Salterton Road
EXMOUTH
Devon
EX8 2NG
- Phone:
- 01395 277404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window