WHITGIFT SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education of pupils at the school, fostering extended relationships with Foundation school parents and pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 January 1976: Standard registration
- WSA (Working name)
- WHITGIFT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Frederick Alan Bayes | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Tall | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.18k | £7.55k | £538 | £16.62k | £22.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.62k | £2.48k | £1.51k | £10.79k | £34.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 June 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 January 2021 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/02/1976 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitgift School
Haling Park
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 6YT
- Phone:
- 02086889222
- Email:
- office@whitgift.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window