Financial history MALDON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity Number: 271339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.95k £2.71k £20.34k £27.20k £65.86k
Total expenditure £7.33k £2.73k £17.92k £23.71k £56.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A