Financial history STOKE ROW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 271363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.80k £20.73k £3.73k £5.05k £6.87k
Total expenditure £2.91k £11.85k £4.56k £4.44k £13.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k N/A N/A N/A