Accounts and annual returns CYFA PATHFINDER VENTURES LIMITED

Charity number: 271391
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2010 24 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 05 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2009 08 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 08 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2008 06 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 06 February 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2007 01 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 17 October 2007 On Time