THE CUCKLINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides building/facilities/open space.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 04 October 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Campbell Dunford | Chair | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Samuel John Crocker | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elwes | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina McKechnie | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Fox | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark David | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Hammet | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER RAWLINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.21k | £12.90k | £12.45k | £8.45k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.79k | £6.98k | £8.46k | £32.75k | £9.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21ST JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF CUCKLINGTON AND STOKE TRISTER WITH BAYFOLD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF CUCKLINGTON AND STOKE TRISTER WITH BAYFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hale House
Cucklington
WINCANTON
Somerset
BA9 9PN
- Phone:
- 0196332788
- Email:
- xinamckechnie@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window