Financial history HIGHAM MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 271461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £23.82k £23.26k £29.37k £28.99k £25.53k
Total expenditure £25.74k £25.47k £23.32k £27.71k £30.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £18.19k £2.67k N/A