GUILDFORD OPERA COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing entertainment, education and appreciation of opera, operetta and all forms of music both in concert and fully staged productions to audiences at reasonable prices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 June 1976: Standard registration
- 31 January 2022: Funds received from 1172129 OPERA FOUNDRY
- G O C - GUILDFORD OPERA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARION HUGHES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jamil Michelle Joseph | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dawn Joseph | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Yvonne Barrett | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN GOODING | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Alberto Garcia Aguilar | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLENYS MARJORIE MAGILL | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RITA ROWLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.89k | £10.48k | £38.01k | £28.74k | £29.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.81k | £3.08k | £18.87k | £38.38k | £47.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 21ST APRIL 1976 AS AMENDED 13TH JANUARY 1993 AND 5TH MAY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Epsom Place
CRANLEIGH
Surrey
GU6 7ET
- Phone:
- 07928049108
- Email:
- mrgarciac@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window