THE FURZEY GARDENS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity maintains ten acres of gardens at Minstead, nr Lyndhurst in the New Forest as a day service horticultural training area for young adults with learning disabilities. As the gardens are also open to the public this enables the students to interact with the visitors, teaching them valuable social and life skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15 June 1976: Standard registration
- 01 August 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 August 2017: Funds transferred to 1053319 MINSTEAD TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.24k | £269.01k | £188.68k | £168.19k | £306.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.00k | £312.76k | £221.97k | £212.27k | £164.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 02 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | 02 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 26 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 12TH DECEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS OR PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window