Financial history CRAPS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £236.94k £170.78k £218.33k £97.04k £247.03k
Total expenditure £233.00k £235.29k £236.12k £239.13k £219.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A