AVON LOCAL MEDICAL COMMITTEE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting family doctors(and/or their families) who work or have worked in Avon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 June 1976: Standard registration
- AVON L M C BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- AVON LOCAL MEDICAL BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr STEPHEN CHARLES ILLINGWORTH | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Nafeesa Arshad | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
LEE RICHARD SALKELD | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY STEVEN FIELDING | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.55k | £10.89k | £13.53k | £11.95k | £12.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.44k | £800 | £16.43k | £60 | £6.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JUNE 1976. as amended on 10 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF ANY MEDICAL PRACTITIONER PRACTISING OR HAVING PRACTISED IN THE COUNTY OF AVON OR HIS OR HER WIFE OR HUSBAND,WIDOW, WIDOWER OR CHILD OR CHILDREN OR OTHER DEPENDANTS WHO SHALL BE IN NEED. 2. THE PAYMENT OR APPLICATION BY WAY OF GRANT OR LOAN (WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST) TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PERSON OR PERSONS BEING A DEPENDANT OR DEPENDANTS OF A MEDICAL PRACTITIONER OR MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS IN THE COUNTY OF AVON BY WAY OF A SCHOLARSHIP OR BURSARY IN MEDICINE OR OTHER SUBJECTS TENABLE AT SOME MEDICAL SCHOOL, INCLUDING A FACULTY OF MEDICINE IN ANY UNIVERSITY APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE PURPOSE AND SUBJECT TO SUCH CONDITIONS AS TO SATISFACTORY ATTENDANCE AND OTHERWISE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
FORMER COUNTY OF AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Orchard Gardens
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
Wiltshire
BA15 1BN
- Phone:
- 01225867047
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window