THE ROBERTS AND JEFFERY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made to children resident in Linkinhorne Parish to assist with the expense of post elementary education. Grants may also be made to improve the health of children attending primary school within Linkinhorne Parish or otherwise promote the education of children in the Parish where expense is an issue.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 08 July 1976: Standard registration
- 29 August 2017: Funds received from 232331 CHARITY OF CECILIA KNILL
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russ Hanson | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lena Batten | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Batkin | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Parker | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Riley | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Carole Browne | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER William DANIEL | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.73k | £1.91k | £2.19k | £1.83k | £2.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30k | £1.75k | £2.19k | £1.69k | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 March 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19TH JUNE 1925 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
(A) IN ASSISTING PUPILS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS, INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY. (B) IN MAKING ARRANGEMENTS FOR ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH OR PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING ANY PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL. (C) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LINKINHORNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nampara
Henwood
LISKEARD
Cornwall
PL14 5BP
- Phone:
- 07854626730
- Email:
- robertsjeffery250@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window